Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1730
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#761
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Elkins
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 688
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 688
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|