Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2419 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            83R13075 T
 By: Elkins H.B. No. 2419


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 Relating to a pilot program authorizing an administrative district
 judge to appoint special magistrates to assist in hearing ad
 valorem tax protests.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 41, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 41.463 to read as follows:
 41.463.  PILOT PROGRAM; APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MAGISTRATES
 TO ASSIST IN CONDUCTING PROTEST HEARINGS IN HARRIS COUNTY. (a) The
 local administrative district judge of Harris County shall appoint
 as many special magistrates as the judge, with the advice of the
 appraisal district board of directors, determines appropriate to
 conduct hearings on protests and recommend determinations in a
 timely manner under this title.
 (b)  A special magistrate may conduct hearings and recommend
 determinations of any matter that the appraisal review board or a
 panel of the board may make under this Chapter.
 (c)  The chairman of the Appraisal Review Board shall assign
 hearings to special magistrates in a manner that does not consider
 the magistrate's record of determinations of prior protests.
 However, cases may be assigned according to the magistrate's
 particular knowledge or expertise.
 (d)  Special magistrates may not be elected or appointed
 officials or employees of a taxing unit, the appraisal district, or
 the comptroller's office, nor persons licensed as tax consultants
 by the Department of Licensing and Regulation. The chief appraiser
 shall annually notify such individuals or their professional
 associations to make known to them that opportunities to serve as
 special magistrates exist. The administrative district judge shall
 establish a reasonable range of per diem compensation for special
 magistrates. The appraisal district budget shall provide an
 appropriate amount for that purpose.
 (e)  If practicable, the administrative district judge shall
 appoint special magistrates according to the following
 qualifications:
 (1)  a special magistrate appointed to hear issues of
 exemptions and classifications shall be a member of The Texas Bar
 with experience in the area of ad valorem taxation;
 (2)  a special magistrate appointed to hear issues
 regarding the valuation of real estate shall be a licensed real
 estate appraiser with not less than 5 years' experience in real
 property valuation;
 (3)  a special magistrate appointed to hear issues
 regarding the valuation of tangible personal property shall be a
 certified public accountant or a designated member of a nationally
 recognized appraiser's organization with experience in tangible
 personal property valuation.
 (4)  Notwithstanding the foregoing, the administrative
 district judge, with the advice of the chairman of the appraisal
 review board, may consider the needs of the appraisal review board
 and the experience of special magistrate candidates in lieu of the
 requirements of subsection (e)(1) through (e)(3), in order to make
 appointments as special magistrates.
 (f)  A special magistrate need not be a resident of the
 county in which he or she serves. A special magistrate may not
 represent a person before the board in any tax year during which he
 or she has served that board as a special magistrate. Before
 appointing a special magistrate, The administrative district judge
 shall verify the special magistrate's qualifications. The judge
 shall ensure that the selection of special magistrates is based
 solely upon the experience and qualifications of the special
 magistrate and is not influenced by the chief appraiser.
 (g)  Hearings by a special magistrate are scheduled and
 conducted in the manner provided by this chapter for hearings of the
 appraisal review board.
 (h)  A special magistrate shall serve as an independent
 contractor to the appraisal review board, subject to appropriation.
 Notwithstanding any agreement between the board of directors of the
 appraisal district or the appraisal review board and the special
 magistrate to the contrary, a special magistrate's services to the
 appraisal review board may be cancelled at any time upon the vote of
 a majority of four of the serving members of the appraisal review
 board.
 (h-1)  A special magistrate may be removed by the local
 administrative district judge for a violation of Section 6.412,
 6.413, 41.66(f), or 41.69, Tax Code.
 (i)  A special magistrate must complete training as
 specified by comptroller rule before commencing hearings for a tax
 year. The comptroller may require that magistrates attend the
 training provided for members of the appraisal review board.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 41, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 41.4631 to read as follows:
 41.4631.  PILOT PROGRAM; APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MAGISTRATES
 EXPIRATION OF CURRENT APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD TERMS. (a) Special
 magistrates shall hold office for terms of two years beginning
 January 1. The appraisal district board of directors by resolution
 shall provide for staggered terms, so that the terms of as close to
 one-half of the special magistrates as possible expire each year.
 In making the initial or subsequent appointments, the local
 administrative district judge shall designate those special
 magistrates who serve terms of one year as needed to comply with
 this subsection.
 (a-1)  Upon the effective date of the pilot program under
 section 41.463, Tax Code, the administrative law judge may begin
 appointing special magistrates for the initial term beginning
 January 1, 2014.
 (b)  Upon the effective date of the pilot program under
 section 41.463, Tax Code, the terms of all then current appraisal
 review board members shall be set to expire on December 31, 2013.
 (c)  Appraisal review board members serving as of the
 effective date of the pilot program under section 41.463, Tax Code,
 are eligible to serve as appraisal review board members under the
 pilot program, unless otherwise prohibited by this title.
 SECTION 3.  Section 6.41, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 Sec. 6.41.  APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD. (b-1) Notwithstanding
 subsection (b), in a county with a population of 3.3 million or
 more, the board shall consist of five members.
 SECTION 4.  Section 6.411, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 6.411.  EX PARTE COMMUNICATIONS; PENALTY. (a)  A member
 of an appraisal review board, or a special magistrate appointed
 under Section 41.463, Tax Code, commits an offense if the member
 communicates with the chief appraiser or another employee or a
 member of the board of directors of the appraisal district for which
 the appraisal review board is established in violation of Section
 41.66(f).
 (b)  A chief appraiser or another employee of an appraisal
 district, a member of a board of directors of an appraisal district,
 or a property tax consultant or attorney representing a party to a
 proceeding before the appraisal review board commits an offense if
 the person communicates with a special magistrate appointed under
 Section 41.463, Tax Code, or a member of the appraisal review board
 established for the appraisal district with the intent to influence
 a decision by the special magistrate or member in the member's
 capacity as a member of the appraisal review board.
 SECTION 5.  Section 41.45, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.45.  HEARING ON PROTEST. (d-1) Notwithstanding
 subsection (d), in a county with a population of 3.3 million or
 more, a special magistrate appointed under section 41.463 shall
 conduct protest hearings. However, the determination of a protest
 heard by a special magistrate must be made by the board. If the
 recommendation of a special magistrate is not accepted by the
 board, the board may refer the matter for rehearing to a separate
 special magistrate, or the board, by majority vote, may determine
 the protest. Before determining a protest or conducting a rehearing
 before a new special magistrate, the board shall deliver notice of
 the hearing or meeting to determine the protest in accordance with
 the provisions of this subchapter.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter C, Chapter 41, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 41.4632 to read as follows: (a) The pilot program
 under section 41.463 shall be implemented in a county with a
 population of 3.3 million or more.
 (b)  Unless continued, the pilot program shall expire on
 December 31, 2017.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.