Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2454 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frank (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2454
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reimbursement of health care services rendered by a
 health care provider for an inmate of a county jail or another
 county correctional facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.036(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Regardless of the application, documentation, and
 verification procedures or eligibility standards established by
 the department under Subchapter A, a county may credit an
 expenditure for an eligible resident toward eligibility for state
 assistance if the eligible resident received the health care
 services at:
 (1)  a hospital maintained or operated by a state
 agency that has a contract with the county to provide health care
 services; [or]
 (2)  a federally qualified health center delivering
 federally qualified health center services, as those terms are
 defined in 42 U.S.C. Sections 1396d(l)(2)(A) and (B), that has a
 contract with the county to provide health care services; or
 (3)  a hospital or other health care provider if the
 eligible resident is an inmate of a county jail or another county
 correctional facility.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *