E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/16/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1899
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3522
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3367
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1268
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#303
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|