Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2482 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Alvarado, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2482
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
 Development; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study to determine the reasons major manufacturers
 have chosen to invest in other states after considering development
 in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  In this Act, "major manufacturer" means a person
 that:
 (1)  is engaged in the business of manufacturing;
 (2)  invested $1 million or more in developing,
 expanding, or maintaining manufacturing operations in another
 state after September 1, 2011, and before September 1, 2014; and
 (3)  was offered economic incentives by the state or a
 local government related to developing, expanding, or maintaining
 manufacturing operations in this state before choosing to make that
 investment.
 SECTION 2.  The comptroller of public accounts shall conduct
 a study on the reasons major manufacturers have chosen to invest in
 other states after the manufacturers were offered economic
 incentives by the state or a local government to develop in this
 state. The study may include examining those reasons specific to
 the economic incentives that were offered and to the promotion of
 manufacturing development.  The comptroller's office shall solicit
 interviews with an executive of each major manufacturer that
 declined the incentives. The interviews must address
 recommendations for this state to effectively compete with other
 states in promoting manufacturing development.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2014, the comptroller
 of public accounts shall provide a report on the results of the
 study, including an analysis of the results, to the speaker of the
 house of representatives, the lieutenant governor, the governor,
 and each standing committee of the legislature that has relevant
 jurisdiction.
 SECTION 4.  This Act expires January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *