Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB25 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            83R23224 KSD-D
 By: Branch, et al. H.B. No. 25
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 25:
 By:  Branch C.S.H.B. No. 25


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to success-based funding for certain public institutions
 of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.0593(e), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d),[:
 [(1)     not more than 10 percent of the total amount of
 general revenue appropriations of base funds for undergraduate
 education recommended by the board for all institutions to which
 Subsection (d) applies for a state fiscal biennium may be based on
 student success measures; and
 [(2)]  the board's recommendation for base funding for
 undergraduate education based on student success measures does not
 reduce or otherwise affect funding recommendations for graduate
 education.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 322, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 322.0082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 322.0082.  STUDENT SUCCESS-BASED FUNDING FOR CERTAIN
 INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (a) In this section, "general
 academic teaching institution" and "public state college" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  In the general appropriations bill prepared for
 introduction to the legislature under Section 322.008, at least 25
 percent of the total amount of general revenue appropriations of
 base funds for undergraduate education for all general academic
 teaching institutions, other than public state colleges, for a
 state fiscal biennium must be based on student success measures
 described by Section 61.0593(d), Education Code.
 (b-1)  Subsection (b) does not apply to a state fiscal
 biennium before the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2019.
 In the general appropriations bill prepared for introduction to the
 legislature under Section 322.008 for the state fiscal biennium
 ending August 31, 2017, at least 15 percent of the total amount of
 general revenue appropriations of base funds for undergraduate
 education for all general academic teaching institutions, other
 than public state colleges, for that state fiscal biennium must be
 based on student success measures described by Section 61.0593(d),
 Education Code. This subsection expires September 1, 2017.
 (c)  In preparing the general appropriations bill to comply
 with the requirements of this section, the director, under the
 direction of the board, shall consider the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board's recommendations under Section 61.0593(d),
 Education Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.