E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5442 | |
E | 05/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3674 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1899 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3519 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3522 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3367 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1268 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Record vote | RV#344 | Journal Page: 1924 |
House | 04/26/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1889 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1889 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Filed |