Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2571 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Keffer (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 2571
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 May 2, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 8, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 8, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inspection of certain information regarding the
 production, transportation, sale, and marketing of oil and gas from
 state land; imposing an administrative penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 52.135, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), (a-3), (e), and (f) and
 amending Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Not later than the 60th day after the date of receipt
 of a request from the commissioner, the attorney general, or the
 governor for information described by Subsection (a), a lessee
 shall produce the requested information.
 (a-2)  A lessee who is unable to produce requested
 information in the time required by Subsection (a-1) must, not
 later than the 30th day after the date of receipt of a request for
 the information, reply in writing to the requestor and state the
 reason for the inability to provide the information in the time
 required and when the information will be available. A requestor
 who receives a reply under this subsection may extend the deadline
 for the production of the requested information by written response
 to the lessee. If the requestor does not extend the deadline, the
 lessee shall produce the information not later than the later of:
 (1)  the fifth day after the date of receipt of a
 written response from the requestor rejecting the extension; or
 (2)  the 60th day after the date of receipt of the
 original request.
 (a-3)  A lessee who withholds requested information on a good
 faith legal basis must, not later than the 60th day after the date
 of receipt of a request for the information, provide the requestor
 with a detailed explanation of the basis for withholding the
 information.
 (c)  A [The] lessee shall have 30 days from the date of the
 receipt of an [such] audit billing notice under Subsection (b) or a
 notice of a penalty assessment under Subsection (e) in which to pay
 the [such] audit deficiency assessment or penalty or to request a
 hearing before the commissioner or the commissioner's [his]
 representative for redetermination of the [such] assessment or to
 challenge the assessment of the penalty. A statement of grounds
 setting out in detail the lessee's reasons for disagreement with
 the [such] assessment or penalty and the factual and legal grounds
 on which the claim is based must be submitted by a lessee with its
 request for a hearing. The [Such] hearing shall be conducted in
 accordance with the rules and procedures established by the
 commissioner.
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), the commissioner
 may assess an administrative penalty against a lessee who fails to
 produce requested information in the time required under Subsection
 (a-1) or (a-2) by intentionally withholding information to which
 the land office is legally entitled. The penalty may not exceed:
 (1)  $100 a day for each day after the deadline for
 producing the information that the lessee fails to produce the
 information until the 60th day after the deadline; and
 (2)  $1,000 a day for each day after the 60th day after
 the deadline for producing the information that the lessee fails to
 produce the information.
 (f)  The commissioner may not assess a penalty against a
 lessee who withholds information under Subsection (a-3) until the
 commissioner determines that the requestor is entitled to the
 information.
 SECTION 2.  Section 52.135, Natural Resources Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a request for information made
 under that section on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 request for information made under that section before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date of the request, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *