E
|
05/24/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4915
|
E
|
05/13/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3018
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1268
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#320
|
Journal Page: 1878
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1878
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1877
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 936
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 936
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|