Senate | 05/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2034 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1690 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2766 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2766 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2766 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2766 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2749 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2749 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2027 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 767 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 767 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Filed |