Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2718 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 2718
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the cultural and fine arts district program
 administered by the Texas Commission on the Arts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 444.031, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (c)  A designated district or, if necessary to comply with
 federal eligibility requirements, a municipality or county in which
 a designated district is located on behalf of the district may apply
 for state incentives, funding, grants, and loans from state
 agencies, including the:
 (1)  Department of Agriculture;
 (2)  Texas Department of Transportation; and
 (3)  office of the governor.
 (d)  The commission shall assist designated districts,
 municipalities, and counties in applying under Subsection (c).
 (e)  The commission may amend the boundaries of a designated
 district to include private sector development.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *