Senate | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1294 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1294 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1217 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1808 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Record vote | RV#299 | Journal Page: 1808 |
House | 04/24/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1808 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1808 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1767 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Amended | 1-Ritter | Journal Page: 1767 |
House | 04/23/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1767 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 772 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 772 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Filed |