Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1570 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1570 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1436 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2203 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2203 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2203 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2203 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 295 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 295 | |
House | 12/13/2012 | Filed |