House | 04/26/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1954 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1286 | Journal Page: 1954 |
House | 04/26/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 905 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 905 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |