House | 04/24/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Referred directly to s/c on Manufacturing by chair | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 979 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 979 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |