E | 05/25/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/25/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5391 | |
E | 05/15/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3522 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1845 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3371 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3241 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1772 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1384 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2102 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | RV#416 | Journal Page: 2102 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2102 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2102 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2062 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2062 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |