Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2851
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2851
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1446
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2296
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#489
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Otto
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Martinez Fischer, Flynn, Alvarado, and Nevrez
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|