1 | 1 | | By: Fletcher (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 3031 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Transportation; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | 5 | | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to fare enforcement officers for metropolitan rapid |
---|
11 | 11 | | transit authorities. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 451.0612, Transportation |
---|
14 | 14 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 451.0612. FARE ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS [IN CERTAIN |
---|
16 | 16 | | AUTHORITIES]. |
---|
17 | 17 | | SECTION 2. Section 451.0612(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
18 | 18 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (a) An authority [confirmed before July 1, 1985, in which |
---|
20 | 20 | | the principal municipality has a population of less than 850,000] |
---|
21 | 21 | | may employ persons to serve as fare enforcement officers to enforce |
---|
22 | 22 | | the payment of fares for use of the public transportation system by: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) requesting and inspecting evidence showing |
---|
24 | 24 | | payment of the appropriate fare from a person using the public |
---|
25 | 25 | | transportation system; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) issuing a citation to a person described by |
---|
27 | 27 | | Section 451.0611(d)(1). |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
29 | 29 | | * * * * * |
---|