Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3031 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fletcher (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 3031
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fare enforcement officers for metropolitan rapid
 transit authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 451.0612, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 451.0612.  FARE ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS [IN CERTAIN
 AUTHORITIES].
 SECTION 2.  Section 451.0612(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An authority [confirmed before July 1, 1985, in which
 the principal municipality has a population of less than 850,000]
 may employ persons to serve as fare enforcement officers to enforce
 the payment of fares for use of the public transportation system by:
 (1)  requesting and inspecting evidence showing
 payment of the appropriate fare from a person using the public
 transportation system; and
 (2)  issuing a citation to a person described by
 Section 451.0611(d)(1).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *