|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3779
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4871
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4915
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4548
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1446
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2187
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2187
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|