Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3067 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Menendez (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 3067
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 17, 2013, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2013,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of an administrative authority for a
 defense economic readjustment zone.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2310.202, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2310.202.  ADMINISTRATION BY ADMINISTRATIVE AUTHORITY.
 (a) The governing body of a readjustment zone may delegate its
 administrative duties to an administrative authority appointed by
 the governing body.
 (b)  An administrative authority must:
 (1)  be composed of 3, 5, 7, 9, 11, or 15 members; and
 (2)  be a viable and responsive body generally
 representative of all public or private entities that have a stake
 in the development of the zone[; and
 [(3)     if the readjustment zone includes private
 residences, include:
 [(A)     an elected official representing
 readjustment zone residents and businesses; or
 [(B)  at least two readjustment zone residents].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *