Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3077 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Miller of Fort Bend, et al. H.B. No. 3077
 (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 17, 2013, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3077 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the display of the Honor and Remember flag.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2165, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2165.0061 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2165.0061.  DISPLAY OF HONOR AND REMEMBER FLAG.
 (a)  In this section, "Honor and Remember flag" means the Honor and
 Remember, Inc. flag.
 (b)  The Honor and Remember flag shall be displayed at each
 state office building on:
 (1)  the third Saturday in May, "Armed Forces Day";
 (2)  the last Monday in May, "Memorial Day";
 (3)  the 14th day of June, "Flag Day";
 (4)  the fourth day of July, "Independence Day";
 (5)  the third Friday in September, "National POW/MIA
 Recognition Day";
 (6)  the last Sunday in September, "Gold Star Mother's
 Day";
 (7)  the 11th day in November, "Veterans Day"; and
 (8)  whenever a resident of this state is a state
 military casualty.
 SECTION 2.  The Honor and Remember flag is designated as the
 symbol of our state's concern and commitment to honoring and
 remembering the lives of all members of the United States armed
 forces who have lost their lives while serving or as a result of
 service and the symbol of our state's commitment to honoring their
 families.
 SECTION 3.  The Honor and Remember flag's red field
 represents the blood shed by the brave men and women who sacrificed
 their lives for freedom, and the flag's white field is in
 recognition of the purity of that sacrifice. The flag's blue star
 is a symbol of active service in military conflict that dates back
 to World War I. The flag's gold star signifies the ultimate
 sacrifice of a warrior in active service who is not returning home
 and reflects the value of the life given. The folded flag element
 highlights this nation's final tribute to a fallen service member
 and a family's sacrifice. The flag's flame symbolizes the eternal
 spirit of the departed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *