Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3097 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lewis (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 3097
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of directors of the board of the Ector
 County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1024.053, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1024.053.  BALLOT PETITION.  A person who wants to have
 the person's name printed on the ballot as a candidate for director
 must file with the board secretary a petition requesting that
 action.  The petition must:
 (1)  be signed by at least 50 registered voters of the
 district as determined by the most recent official list of
 registered voters;
 (2)  be filed not later than 5 p.m. on the same [62nd]
 day that an application for a place on the ballot must be filed
 under Section 144.005, Election Code [before the date of the
 election]; and
 (3)  specify the single-member district [commissioners
 precinct] the candidate wants to represent [or specify that the
 candidate wants to represent the district at large].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *