E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5442 | |
E | 05/23/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4878 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2809 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4158 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4294 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4069 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2322 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2322 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2322 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2322 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2035 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1862 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1574 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1574 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1446 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2297 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Record vote | RV#491 | Journal Page: 2296 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2296 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2296 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |