Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3125 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3125
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to route designation for the issuance of a permit for the
 movement of oversize and overweight vehicles in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 623.219(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  For a permit issued by a port authority located in a
 county that borders the United Mexican States, the commission
 shall, with the consent of the port authority, designate the most
 direct route from:
 (1)  the Gateway International Bridge or the Veterans
 International Bridge at Los Tomates to the entrance of the Port of
 Brownsville using State Highways 48 and 4 or United States Highways
 77 and 83 or using United States Highway 77 and United States
 Highway 83, East Loop Corridor, and State Highway 4; and
 (2)  the Free Trade International Bridge to the
 entrance of the Port of Brownsville using Farm-to-Market Road 509,
 United States Highways 77 and 83, Farm-to-Market Road 511, State
 Highway 550, and East Loop (State Highway 32).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *