House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 298 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 298 | |
House | 12/20/2012 | Filed |