Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3137 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3137
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to limiting the amount of a fee or assessment imposed by
 the Rio Grande Regional Water Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 4.04(b) and (d), Chapter 385, Acts of
 the 78th Legislature, Regular Session, 2003, are amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Each fiscal year, the board shall determine the amount
 of the fee or assessment based on the water rights held by the
 affected entity.  The fee or assessment may not exceed five cents
 per acre-foot.
 (d)  An initial fee or assessment imposed under this section
 may not exceed five cents per acre-foot for each water right held by
 the affected entity.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a fee or assessment that is imposed by the Rio Grande Regional Water
 Authority on or after the effective date of this Act. A fee or
 assessment that is imposed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the fee or assessment was
 imposed, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *