Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3178 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 3178
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security; May 15, 2013,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Statewide Mutual Aid System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 418.115(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A request for mutual aid assistance may be submitted
 verbally or in writing.  If a request is submitted verbally, it
 must be confirmed in writing [not later than the 30th day after the
 date the request was made].
 SECTION 2.  Section 418.1181(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  If a local government entity requests mutual aid
 assistance from another local government entity under the system
 that requires a response that exceeds 12 consecutive hours, the
 requesting local government entity shall reimburse the actual costs
 of providing mutual aid assistance to the responding local
 government entity, including costs for personnel, operation and
 maintenance of equipment, damaged equipment, food, lodging, and
 transportation, incurred by the responding local government entity
 in response to a request for reimbursement.  Local government
 entities with a mutual aid agreement when the request for mutual aid
 assistance is made are subject to the agreement's terms of
 reimbursement, as provided by Section 418.111.
 SECTION 3.  Section 418.114, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 418.115(a) and 418.1181(a), Government
 Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to mutual aid assistance
 requested on or after the effective date of this Act. Mutual aid
 assistance requested before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the aid was requested, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *