Senate | 05/13/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1731 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3069 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#787 | Journal Page: 3069 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3069 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3068 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2999 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2999 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2999 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 826 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 826 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |