E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/23/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4879
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2313
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2313
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2313
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1711
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1711
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2588
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#606
|
Journal Page: 2587
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2587
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2587
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2524
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Ritter
|
Journal Page: 2523
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2523
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 827
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 827
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|