Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3233 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ritter, Johnson, Taylor H.B. No. 3233
 (Senate Sponsor - Fraser)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to interbasin transfers of state water.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 11.085(b), (e), (g), (l), (n), and (v),
 Water Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The application must include:
 (1)  the contract price of the water to be transferred;
 (2)  a statement of each general category of proposed
 use of the water to be transferred and a detailed description of the
 proposed uses and users under each category; and
 (3)  the cost of diverting, conveying, distributing,
 and supplying the water to, and treating the water for, the proposed
 users[; and
 [(4)     the projected effect on user rates and fees for
 each class of ratepayers].
 (e)  In addition to the public meetings required by
 Subsection (d) [of this section], if the application is contested
 in a manner requiring an evidentiary hearing under the rules of the
 commission, the commission shall give notice and hold an
 evidentiary hearing, in accordance with commission rules and
 applicable state law. An evidentiary hearing on an application to
 transfer water authorized under an existing water right is limited
 to considering issues related to the requirements of this section.
 (g)  The applicant shall cause the notice of application for
 an interbasin transfer to be published in two different weeks
 within a 30-day period [once a week for two consecutive weeks] in
 one or more newspapers having general circulation in each county
 located in whole or in part in the basin of origin or the receiving
 basin. The published notice may not be smaller than 96.8 square
 centimeters or 15 square inches with the shortest dimension at
 least 7.6 centimeters or three inches. The notice of application
 and public meetings shall be combined in the mailed and published
 notices.
 (l)  The commission may grant, in whole or in part, an
 application for an interbasin transfer only to the extent that:
 (1)  the detriments to the basin of origin during the
 proposed transfer period are less than the benefits to the
 receiving basin during the proposed transfer period, as determined
 by the commission based on consideration of the factors described
 by Subsection (k); and
 (2)  the applicant for the interbasin transfer has
 prepared a drought contingency plan and has developed and
 implemented a water conservation plan that will result in the
 highest practicable levels of water conservation and efficiency
 achievable within the jurisdiction of the applicant.
 (n)  If the transfer of water is based on a contractual sale
 of water, the new water right or amended permit, certified filing,
 or certificate of adjudication authorizing the transfer shall
 contain a condition for a term or period not greater than the term
 of the contract, including any extension or renewal of the contract
 [term].
 (v)  The provisions of this section, except Subsection (a),
 do not apply to:
 (1)  a proposed transfer which in combination with any
 existing transfers totals less than 3,000 acre-feet of water per
 annum from the same permit, certified filing, or certificate of
 adjudication;
 (2)  a request for an emergency transfer of water;
 (3)  a proposed transfer from a basin to its adjoining
 coastal basin;
 (4)  a proposed transfer from the part of the
 geographic area of [a basin to] a county or municipality, or the
 part of the retail service area of a retail public utility as
 defined by Section 13.002, [the municipality's retail service area]
 that is [partially] within the basin of origin for use in that part
 of the geographic area of the county or municipality, or that
 contiguous part of the retail service area of the utility, [and the
 municipality's retail service area] not within the basin of origin;
 or
 (5)  a proposed transfer of water that is:
 (A)  imported from a source located wholly outside
 the boundaries of this state, except water that is imported from a
 source located in the United Mexican States;
 (B)  for use in this state; and
 (C)  transported by using the bed and banks of any
 flowing natural stream located in this state.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for an interbasin transfer filed with the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality on or after the effective date
 of this Act. An application filed before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the application was
 filed, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *