Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3314 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 3314
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 20, 2013, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to instruction and continuing education requirements for
 certain court clerks.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 51.605(b) and (c), Government Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A clerk shall complete 20 hours of instruction regarding
 the performance of the clerk's duties of office before the first
 anniversary of the date the clerk assumes those duties [during each
 calendar year that begins after the clerk's election or appointment
 to office].
 (c)  After the first anniversary of the date a clerk assumes
 the duties of office, the [A] clerk must each calendar year
 complete 20 hours of continuing education courses. [A clerk must,
 during the first year of each term of office, complete:
 [(1)     at least one hour of continuing education courses
 regarding registry funds handled under Chapter 117, Local
 Government Code, in the performance of the duties of office; and
 [(2)     at least one hour of continuing education courses
 regarding fraudulent court documents and fraudulent document
 filings.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.605(b), Government Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies to a court clerk who assumes the duties of
 office on or after the effective date of this Act. A court clerk who
 assumes the duties of office before that date is governed by the law
 in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *