Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB333 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen, Springer (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 333
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring notice of a hotel's firearms policy and other
 guest policies; providing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2155, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter C to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C. FIREARMS POLICY NOTICE
 Sec. 2155.101.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "hotel" has
 the meaning assigned by Section 156.001, Tax Code.
 Sec. 2155.102. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER.  This subchapter
 applies only to a hotel that has a policy prohibiting or restricting
 the possession, storage, or transportation of firearms by hotel
 guests.
 Sec. 2155.103.  NOTICE REGARDING FIREARMS POLICY. (a)  A
 hotel shall include on the hotel's Internet reservation website the
 hotel's policy regarding the possession, storage, and
 transportation of firearms.
 (b)  If a hotel provides a written confirmation or a written
 statement of terms and conditions to a consumer after accepting the
 consumer's hotel reservation by telephone, the hotel shall include
 information specifying how the consumer may review applicable guest
 policies. The guest policies must indicate the hotel's policy
 regarding the possession, storage, and transportation of firearms
 by guests.
 (c)  A hotel owner or keeper commits an offense if the person
 does not comply with this section. An offense under this subsection
 is a misdemeanor punishable by a fine of not more than $100.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *