Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3332 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Keffer (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 3332
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to junior college district territory annexation and
 program approval in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.063, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (e), a [A] junior
 college district may not annex territory under this section if a
 campus of the Texas State Technical College System is located:
 (1)  within the county in which the territory is
 located; and
 (2)  outside the junior college district.
 (e)  This section does not prevent a junior college district
 from annexing territory located in Brown County.
 SECTION 2.  Section 135.04(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Before any program may be offered by a campus or
 extension center within the tax district of a public junior college
 that is operating a vocational and technical program, it must be
 established that the public junior college is not capable of
 offering or is unable to offer the program. After it is established
 that a need for the program exists and that the program is not
 locally available, the campus or extension center may offer the
 program, provided approval is secured from the coordinating board.
 Approval of technical-vocational programs under this section does
 not apply to Brown, McLennan, Cameron, and Potter counties.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *