Senate | 05/15/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1263 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1857 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1856 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | RV#303 | Journal Page: 1857 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1857 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1857 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1839 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1839 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 300 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 300 | |
House | 12/28/2012 | Filed |