H.B. No. 3401 AN ACT relating to nutrition and wellness education for certain recipients of certain state benefits. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 531.0995 to read as follows: Sec. 531.0995. NUTRITION AND WELLNESS EDUCATION. (a) This section applies to individuals receiving benefits under: (1) the financial assistance program under Chapter 31, Human Resources Code; (2) the medical assistance program under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code; or (3) the supplemental nutrition assistance program under Chapter 33, Human Resources Code. (b) The commission shall work with community-based organizations to encourage individuals receiving benefits to access readily available and existing online information and programs, including information provided on the commission's website, that provide nutrition and wellness education for the purpose of promoting healthy eating habits and a physically active lifestyle. (c) Not later than January 1, 2015, the commission shall report to the legislature on the use of nutrition and wellness education information provided on the commission's website. The report must include: (1) feedback from clients on the effectiveness of the information accessed; and (2) any available data on the number of individuals who accessed the information. (d) The executive commissioner may adopt rules to implement this section. (e) This section expires September 1, 2015. SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the waiver or authorization is granted. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3401 was passed by the House on May 8, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 127, Nays 20, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3401 was passed by the Senate on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor