Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3401 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 3401
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to nutrition and wellness education for certain recipients
 of certain state benefits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0995 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0995.  NUTRITION AND WELLNESS EDUCATION. (a) This
 section applies to individuals receiving benefits under:
 (1)  the financial assistance program under Chapter 31,
 Human Resources Code;
 (2)  the medical assistance program under Chapter 32,
 Human Resources Code; or
 (3)  the supplemental nutrition assistance program
 under Chapter 33, Human Resources Code.
 (b)  The commission shall work with community-based
 organizations to encourage individuals receiving benefits to
 access readily available and existing online information and
 programs, including information provided on the commission's
 website, that provide nutrition and wellness education for the
 purpose of promoting healthy eating habits and a physically active
 lifestyle.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2015, the commission shall
 report to the legislature on the use of nutrition and wellness
 education information provided on the commission's website. The
 report must include:
 (1)  feedback from clients on the effectiveness of the
 information accessed; and
 (2)  any available data on the number of individuals
 who accessed the information.
 (d)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules to implement
 this section.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *