1 | 1 | | By: Raymond, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 3401 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to nutrition and wellness education for certain recipients |
---|
11 | 11 | | of certain state benefits. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended by adding Section 531.0995 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 531.0995. NUTRITION AND WELLNESS EDUCATION. (a) This |
---|
16 | 16 | | section applies to individuals receiving benefits under: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) the financial assistance program under Chapter 31, |
---|
18 | 18 | | Human Resources Code; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) the medical assistance program under Chapter 32, |
---|
20 | 20 | | Human Resources Code; or |
---|
21 | 21 | | (3) the supplemental nutrition assistance program |
---|
22 | 22 | | under Chapter 33, Human Resources Code. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) The commission shall work with community-based |
---|
24 | 24 | | organizations to encourage individuals receiving benefits to |
---|
25 | 25 | | access readily available and existing online information and |
---|
26 | 26 | | programs, including information provided on the commission's |
---|
27 | 27 | | website, that provide nutrition and wellness education for the |
---|
28 | 28 | | purpose of promoting healthy eating habits and a physically active |
---|
29 | 29 | | lifestyle. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (c) Not later than January 1, 2015, the commission shall |
---|
31 | 31 | | report to the legislature on the use of nutrition and wellness |
---|
32 | 32 | | education information provided on the commission's website. The |
---|
33 | 33 | | report must include: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (1) feedback from clients on the effectiveness of the |
---|
35 | 35 | | information accessed; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) any available data on the number of individuals |
---|
37 | 37 | | who accessed the information. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (d) The executive commissioner may adopt rules to implement |
---|
39 | 39 | | this section. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2015. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
42 | 42 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
43 | 43 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
44 | 44 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
45 | 45 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
46 | 46 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
48 | 48 | | * * * * * |
---|