Senate | 05/07/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1270 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1856 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | RV#303 | Journal Page: 1859 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 907 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 907 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |