Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB349 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 349
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to electronically filing any court document in a criminal
 case in Hidalgo County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.194, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 2.  Section 24.195, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 3.  Section 24.241, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 4.  Section 24.385, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 5.  Section 24.452, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 6.  Section 24.478, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 7.  Section 24.515, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 8.  Section 24.534, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 9.  Section 24.543, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 10.  Section 24.574, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 11.  Section 24.593, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A party in a criminal case before the court may
 electronically file any required court document.  The court shall
 implement the statewide electronic court filing system to assist a
 party in electronic filing.
 SECTION 12.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *