Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1731
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#761
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Oliveira
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2365
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 993
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 993
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|