Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3573 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Aycock (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 3573
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 13, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for obtaining a health science
 technology education teaching certificate and to the scope of
 courses a person may teach holding a technology applications
 teaching certificate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.044, Education Code, as amended by
 Chapters 635 (S.B. 866) and 926 (S.B. 1620), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is reenacted and amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 21.044.  EDUCATOR PREPARATION. (a) The board shall
 propose rules establishing the training requirements a person must
 accomplish to obtain a certificate, enter an internship, or enter
 an induction-year program. The board shall specify the minimum
 academic qualifications required for a certificate.
 (b)  Any minimum academic qualifications for a certificate
 specified under Subsection (a) that require a person to possess a
 bachelor's degree must also require that the person receive, as
 part of the curriculum for that degree, instruction in detection
 and education of students with dyslexia. This subsection does not
 apply to a person who obtains a certificate through an alternative
 certification program adopted under Section 21.049.
 (c)  The instruction under Subsection (b) must:
 (1)  be developed by a panel of experts in the diagnosis
 and treatment of dyslexia who are:
 (A)  employed by institutions of higher
 education; and
 (B)  approved by the board; and
 (2)  include information on:
 (A)  characteristics of dyslexia;
 (B)  identification of dyslexia; and
 (C)  effective, multisensory strategies for
 teaching students with dyslexia.
 (d) [(b)]  In proposing rules under this section, the board
 shall specify that to obtain a certificate to teach an "applied STEM
 course," as that term is defined by Section 28.027, at a secondary
 school, a person must:
 (1)  pass the certification test administered by the
 recognized national or international business and industry group
 that created the curriculum the applied STEM course is based on; and
 (2)  have at a minimum:
 (A)  an associate degree from an accredited
 institution of higher education; and
 (B)  three years of work experience in an
 occupation for which the applied STEM course is intended to prepare
 the student.
 (e)  In proposing rules under this section for a person to
 obtain a certificate to teach a health science technology education
 course, the board shall specify that a person must have:
 (1)  an associate degree or more advanced degree from
 an accredited institution of higher education;
 (2)  current licensure, certification, or registration
 as a health professions practitioner issued by a nationally
 recognized accrediting agency for health professionals; and
 (3)  at least two years of wage earning experience
 utilizing the licensure requirement.
 (f)  The board may not propose rules for a certificate to
 teach a health science technology education course that specify
 that a person must have a bachelor's degree or that establish any
 other credential or teaching experience requirements that exceed
 the requirements under Subsection (e).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.0486 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0486.  TECHNOLOGY APPLICATIONS CERTIFICATION. A
 person who holds a technology applications certificate issued under
 this subchapter may, in addition to teaching technology
 applications courses as authorized under the certificate, teach
 courses in:
 (1)  principles of arts, audio/video technology, and
 communications; and
 (2)  principles of information technology.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *