Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3604 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Burnam, Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 3604
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the implementation of a water conservation plan and
 drought contingency plan, as applicable, by certain entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 16.055, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (h) and adding Subsection (j) to read as
 follows:
 (h)  On receipt of the notice under Subsection (g)(2)(B), the
 person or entity shall immediately implement the person's or
 entity's water conservation plan and [or] drought contingency plan,
 as applicable.
 (j)  The board may notify the commission if the board
 determines that a person or entity has violated Subsection (h).
 Notwithstanding Section 7.051(b), a violation of Subsection (h) is
 enforceable in the manner provided by Chapter 7 for a violation of a
 provision of this code within the commission's jurisdiction or of a
 rule adopted by the commission under a provision of this code within
 the commission's jurisdiction.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *