Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3659 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Reynolds (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 3659
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Houston Community College System District service
 area.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.182, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 130.182.  HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT
 SERVICE AREA. The service area of the Houston Community College
 System District includes the territory within:
 (1)  the Houston, Alief, Katy, Spring Branch, and North
 Forest independent school districts;
 (2)  the Stafford Municipal School District; and
 (3)  the part of the Fort Bend Independent School
 District that is located in the municipalities [municipality] of
 Houston, Missouri City, and Pearland.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *