House
|
05/08/2013
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 1814
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 941
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 941
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|