Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3677 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 3677
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of Foundation School Program license
 plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.663 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.663.  FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM LICENSE PLATES.
 (a) The department shall issue specially designed license plates
 to benefit the Foundation School Program.  The department shall
 design the license plates in consultation with the Texas Education
 Agency.
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs, the department shall deposit the remainder of the fee for
 issuance of license plates under this section to the credit of the
 foundation school fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *