Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3729 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 3729
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to licensing requirements for newly constructed assisted
 living facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 247.021(g), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (g)  The department shall, upon submission of a written
 request by the applicant, automatically issue a six-month
 provisional license without conducting a life safety code
 inspection before issuance of the provisional license to a newly
 constructed facility if:
 (1)  the license applicant has submitted building plans
 to the department for an early compliance review in accordance with
 Section 247.0261 [facility is in compliance with resident care
 standards];
 (2)  all local approvals, including a certificate of
 occupancy where required, have been obtained;
 (3)  a complete license application form is submitted
 within 30 days of receipt of all local approvals;
 (4)  the license fee has been paid;
 (5)  [before beginning construction, the license
 applicant submits working drawings and specifications to the
 department for review; and
 [(6)]  the department determines that the license
 applicant or a person who owns the license applicant and controls
 the operations of the license applicant constructed another
 facility in this state that complies with the department's life
 safety code standards; and
 (6)  the facility is in compliance with resident care
 standards based on an on-site health inspection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *