House | 05/07/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2721 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1468 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 944 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 944 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |