Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3798 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3798
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to expenditures made by emergency services districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 775.073, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.073.  EXPENDITURES [METHOD OF PAYMENT]. (a)
 Except as otherwise provided by this section, district [District]
 funds may be disbursed only by check, draft, order, or other
 instrument that:
 (1)  is signed by at least a majority of the board's
 commissioners; or
 (2)  is signed by the treasurer and countersigned by
 the president. [If the treasurer is absent or unavailable, the
 assistant treasurer may sign for the treasurer. If the president is
 absent or unavailable, the vice president may sign for the
 president.]
 (b)  The board by resolution may allow a district employee
 who has executed a bond in an amount equal to the amount required
 for the district treasurer to sign an instrument to disburse
 district funds. An expenditure of more than $2,000 may not be paid
 [from tax money] unless [a sworn itemized account covering] the
 expenditure is presented to the board and the board approves the
 expenditure.
 (c)  The board may authorize the disbursement of district
 funds transferred by federal reserve wire system. The board by
 resolution may authorize wire transfers to accounts in the
 district's name or accounts not in the district's name.
 (d)  Any property, including an interest in property,
 purchased or leased using district funds, wholly or partly, must
 remain the property of the district, regardless of whether the
 property is used by a third party under a contract for services or
 otherwise, until:
 (1)  the property is sold to a third party following the
 procedures authorized under Section 263.003, 263.007, or 263.008,
 Local Government Code; or
 (2)  the property is disposed of in accordance with
 Subchapter J.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *