House
|
05/17/2013
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1000
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1000
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|